Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/30/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/30/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/11/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/18/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/18/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/18/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/24/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/24/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/26/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/26/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/08/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/08/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/14/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/14/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 06/15/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/17/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/23/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/05/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew