Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 04/27/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/27/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/27/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/29/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/13/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/25/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/30/1999