Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/30/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/03/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/04/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/06/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/11/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/18/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/19/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/19/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/19/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/20/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/26/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/27/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/27/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/27/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/07/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/07/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/07/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/09/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/01/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew