Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/29/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/26/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/26/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/26/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/22/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/22/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/22/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/09/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/09/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/09/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/21/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/18/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/18/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/18/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/22/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/09/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/09/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/13/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/27/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/27/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/27/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/05/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/14/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/14/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/14/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/14/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/14/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/19/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/27/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/27/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/27/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/27/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/27/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/05/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/05/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/05/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/05/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/05/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/12/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/12/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/12/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/18/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/18/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/25/2000