Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/30/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/30/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/30/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/05/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/12/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/21/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/22/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/22/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/27/2000