Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/20/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/20/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/20/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/20/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/14/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/14/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/14/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/14/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/14/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/14/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/02/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/02/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/02/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/15/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/15/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/21/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/28/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/08/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/08/1999