There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Childrens' [sic] Internet Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Childrens' [sic] Internet Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the installation and use by schools and libraries of a technology for filtering or blocking material on the Internet on computers with Internet access to be eligible to receive or retain universal service assistance.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/05/1999Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-141.
01/19/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
08/05/1999Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
Action By: Senate
08/05/1999Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-141.
06/23/1999Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/20/1999Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-828.
03/04/1999Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-603.
01/19/1999Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Action By: Senate
01/19/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S531-532)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/19/1999 Referred to
05/20/1999 Hearings by
06/23/1999 Markup by
08/05/1999 Reported by S. Rept. 106-141

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.97. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (08/05/1999)

Childrens' (sic) Internet Protection Act - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to make an elementary or secondary school having computers with Internet access, or a library with one or more computers with Internet access, ineligible to receive universal services at discount rates unless the authority responsible for the administration of such school or library certifies to the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) that it: (1) has selected a technology for such computers which filters or blocks access to material that is obscene and to child pornography; and (2) is enforcing a policy to ensure the operation of such technology during any use of such computers by minors. Allows such authority to use a technology which filters other material deemed inappropriate for minors. Requires such certification within 30 days, with certain exceptions (requiring exception notification to the FCC). Requires schools or libraries obtaining such computers after the effective date of this Act to make such certification within ten days after the date on which the school first becomes covered.

Requires each covered school or library not in compliance with such requirements to reimburse each telecommunications carrier in an amount equal to the universal services discount received. Requires the FCC to determine the date such discount shall cease to apply to a noncomplying school or library, and to resume the discount upon certification of compliance. Prohibits Federal agencies from: (1) making determinations of other material inappropriate for minors; (2) reviewing a determination made by a school or library authority with respect to verification; or (3) considering the criteria employed by such authority to determine eligibility for universal services discount rates.

Allows discounted universal services rates: (1) to be available only for services covered by FCC regulations on priorities for funding telecommunications services (including the Internet) that assign priority for available funds for the poorest schools; and (2) to be used for the purchase or acquisition of appropriate filtering or blocking products, but not for the purchase of unrelated software or other technology.