Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/09/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/09/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/09/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/09/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/09/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/23/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/23/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/15/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/13/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/05/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/05/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/22/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/25/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 10/02/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/02/2000