Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/16/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/22/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/22/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/23/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/06/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/07/2000