Text: S.Con.Res.160 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill

 
[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Con. Res. 160 Enrolled Bill (ENR)]

        S.Con.Res.160
                                      Agreed to November 3, 2000        

                       One Hundred Sixth Congress

                                 of the

                        United States of America


                          AT THE SECOND SESSION

           Begun and held at the City of Washington on Monday,
             the twenty-fourth day of January, two thousand


                          Concurrent Resolution

    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), 
That when the Senate recesses or adjourns at the close of business on 
Thursday, November 2, 2000, or on Monday, November 6, 2000, on a motion 
offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader 
or his designee, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Tuesday, 
November 14, 2000, or until such time on that day as may be specified 
by its Majority Leader or his designee in the motion to recess or 
adjourn, or until noon on the second day after Members are notified to 
reassemble pursuant to section 2 of this concurrent resolution, 
whichever occurs first; and that when the House adjourns on the 
legislative day of Thursday, November 2, 2000, Friday, November 3, 
2000, Saturday, November 4, 2000, Sunday, November 5, 2000, Monday, 
November 6, 2000, Tuesday, November 7, 2000, Wednesday, November 8, 
2000, or Thursday, November 9, 2000, on a motion offered pursuant to 
this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader or his designee, it 
stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, November 13, 2000, or until 
noon on the second day after Members are notified to reassemble 
pursuant to section 2 of this concurrent resolution, whichever occurs 
first.
    Sec. 2. The Majority Leader of the Senate and the Speaker of the 
House, acting jointly after consultation with the Minority Leader of 
the Senate and the Minority Leader of the House, shall notify the 
Members of the Senate and House, respectively, to reassemble whenever, 
in their opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.
  Attest:

                                               Secretary of the Senate.

  Attest:

                                 Clerk of the House of Representatives.