Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/13/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/14/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/19/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/20/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/14/1999