There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution condemning Palestinian efforts to revive the original Palestine partition plan of November 29, 1947, and condemning the United Nations Commission on Human Rights for its April 27, 1999, resolution endorsing Palestinian self-determination on the basis of the original Palestine partition plan.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/01/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8190)
06/30/1999Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/27/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
07/12/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
07/12/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/12/1999-12:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/01/1999SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8190)
06/30/1999SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/30/1999SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
06/30/1999SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/27/1999SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/27/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6381-6382)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/27/1999 Referred to
06/30/1999 Markup by
06/30/1999 Reported by
House International Relations07/12/1999 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.36. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/27/1999)

Condemns: (1) Palestinian efforts to circumvent United Nations (UN) Security Council Resolutions 242 and 338, as well as violate the Oslo peace process, by attempting to revive UN General Assembly Resolution 181 and thereby placing the Israeli-Palestinian peace process at risk; and (2) the UN Commission on Human Rights for voting to formally endorse such Resolution as the basis for the future of Palestinian self-determination.

Reiterates: (1) that any just and final peace agreement regarding the final status of the territory controlled by the Palestinians can only be determined through direct negotiations and agreement between the State of Israel and the Palestine Liberation Organization; and (2) Congress' continued unequivocal support for the security and well-being of the State of Israel and of the Oslo peace process based on UN Security Council Resolutions 242 and 338.

Calls for the President to declare that: (1) it is U.S. policy that UN General Assembly Resolution 181 is null and void; (2) all negotiations between Israel and the Palestinians must be based on UN Security Council Resolutions 242 and 338; and (3) the United States regards any attempt by the Palestinians, the UN, or any entity to resurrect UN General Assembly Resolution 181 as a basis for negotiations, or for any international decision, as an attempt to sabotage the prospects for a successful peace agreement in the Middle East.