Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/27/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/14/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/14/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/14/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 06/14/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/14/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/14/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/14/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/14/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/15/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/21/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/21/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/01/1999