There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing congressional opposition to the unilateral declaration of a Palestinian state and urging the President to assert clearly United States opposition to such a unilateral declaration of statehood.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/11/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 98-1. Record Vote No: 38.
03/11/1999Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/04/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
03/15/1999-2:34pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/15/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/15/1999-2:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/11/1999SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 98-1. Record Vote No: 38.
03/11/1999SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2535-2542, S2556)
03/11/1999SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/04/1999SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/08/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/08/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/09/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/09/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/10/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/10/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/10/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/10/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 02/10/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/10/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 02/10/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/11/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 02/11/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/11/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/11/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/11/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/12/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/12/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/12/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/12/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 02/22/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/22/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/22/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/22/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/22/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/22/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/23/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/23/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/23/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/23/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/23/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/23/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/23/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/23/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/24/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/24/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/24/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 02/24/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/24/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/24/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/25/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/25/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/25/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/25/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/25/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/25/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/25/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/02/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/02/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/02/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/02/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/02/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/02/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/02/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/02/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/02/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/02/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/02/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/02/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/02/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/02/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/02/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/02/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/03/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/03/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/03/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/03/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/03/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/04/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/04/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/08/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 03/08/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/10/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/10/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/11/1999

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations02/04/1999 Referred to
03/11/1999 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.5. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/04/1999)

Declares that: (1) the final political status of the territory controlled by the Palestinian Authority can only be determined through negotiations and agreement between Israel and the Palestinian Authority; (2) any attempt to establish Palestinian statehood outside the negotiating process will invoke the strongest congressional opposition; and (3) the President should unequivocally assert U.S. opposition to the unilateral declaration of a Palestinian state.