Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 10/15/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/25/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/26/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/28/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/04/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 11/16/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/31/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/10/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 02/24/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/01/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/07/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/07/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/08/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/20/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/20/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/20/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/20/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/22/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/05/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/25/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/26/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/27/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/01/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/04/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/04/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 05/11/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/11/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/16/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/16/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/16/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/18/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/18/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/18/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/18/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/15/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/10/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/10/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/10/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/14/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/19/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/19/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/19/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/19/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/19/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/21/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/27/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/27/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/08/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/08/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/08/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/28/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/03/2000