There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of Congress that Miami, Florida, and not a competing foreign city, should serve as the permanent location for the Secretariat of the Free Trade Area of the Americas (FTAA) beginning in 2005.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/11/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2054)
11/19/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/1999Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14923)
11/08/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/11/2000-2:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/11/2000-2:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2054)
04/11/2000-2:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 71.
04/11/2000-2:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2054-2057)
04/11/2000-2:07pmHouseMr. Crane moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
02/01/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/27/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
11/22/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/22/1999-1:47pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/22/1999-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/19/1999SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/1999SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14923)
11/08/1999SenateReferred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 11/08/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance11/08/1999 Referred to
11/19/1999 Discharged from
House Ways and Means01/27/2000 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade02/01/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.71. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/08/1999)

Expresses the sense of Congress that the President should direct the U.S. representative to the Free Trade Area of the Americas (FTAA) negotiations to use all available means to secure Miami, Florida, as the permanent site of the FTAA Secretariat after February 28, 2005.