Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/22/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/23/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/23/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/24/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/29/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/29/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/21/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/11/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/25/2000