Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/21/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/21/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 04/21/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/22/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/22/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/22/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 04/27/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/27/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/03/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/03/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/03/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/05/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/05/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/05/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/05/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/12/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/12/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/12/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/12/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/12/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/12/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/12/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/12/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/12/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/12/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/12/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/12/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/12/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/12/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/18/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/18/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/25/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/25/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/25/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 05/25/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/25/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/25/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 05/25/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/25/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/25/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/26/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/29/1999