Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 08/02/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/21/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/31/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/01/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/11/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/19/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/11/2000