Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/08/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/08/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/08/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/08/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/08/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/08/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/08/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/09/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/09/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/09/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/09/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/09/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/10/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/22/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/22/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/22/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/22/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/22/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 02/22/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/22/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/22/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/22/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/22/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/22/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/22/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/01/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/01/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/01/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/01/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/01/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/01/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/01/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/01/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/01/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/01/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/01/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/01/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/01/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/01/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/01/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/01/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 03/01/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/01/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/01/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/01/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/01/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/01/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/01/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/01/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/06/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/06/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/06/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/08/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/09/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/09/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/09/2000