Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 04/06/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/06/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/12/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/12/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/12/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/12/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/12/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/13/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/13/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/13/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 04/25/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/25/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/25/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/08/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/08/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/10/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/10/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/10/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/10/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/10/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/10/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/10/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/10/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/10/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/10/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/11/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/11/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/11/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/16/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/18/2000