Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/12/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/17/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/17/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/17/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/17/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/17/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/17/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/17/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/17/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/17/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/17/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/17/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/17/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/17/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/18/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/18/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/18/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/18/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/18/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/18/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/18/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/18/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/18/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/18/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/18/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/18/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/18/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/18/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/19/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/19/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/19/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/19/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/19/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/19/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/19/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/19/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/19/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/19/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/19/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/19/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 07/19/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/19/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/19/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/21/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/21/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/21/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/24/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/26/2000