There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to contributions and expenditures intended to affect elections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/19/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/23/1999Referred to Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, Property.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/19/1999Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate
01/19/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S712-713)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 01/20/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/27/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/03/1999

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary01/19/1999 Referred to
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/23/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.6.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.6. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/19/1999)

Constitutional Amendment - Grants authority to Congress to set reasonable limits on contributions and expenditures made by, in support of, or in opposition to, a candidate for nomination or election to Federal office as well as to a State to set similar reasonable limits with regard to nomination or election to State or local office.