Text: S.Res.16 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (01/08/1999)

 
[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 16 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]







106th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. RES. 16

    To provide for issuance of a summons and for related procedures 
   concerning the articles of impeachment against William Jefferson 
                Clinton, President of the United States.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            January 8, 1999

    Mr. Lott (for himself and Mr. Daschle) submitted the following 
             resolution; which was considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
    To provide for issuance of a summons and for related procedures 
   concerning the articles of impeachment against William Jefferson 
                Clinton, President of the United States.

    Resolved, That the summons be issued in the usual form provided 
that the President may have until 12:00 noon on Monday, January 11, 
1999, to file his answer with the Secretary of the Senate, and the 
House of Representatives have until 12:00 noon on Wednesday, January 
13, 1999, to file its replication with the Secretary of the Senate, 
together with the record which will consist of those publicly available 
materials that have been submitted to or produced by the House 
Judiciary Committee, including transcripts of public hearings or mark-
ups and any materials printed by the House of Representatives or the 
House Judiciary Committee pursuant to House Resolutions 525 and 581. 
Such record will be admitted into evidence, printed, and made available 
to Senators. If the House of Representatives wishes to file a trial 
brief it shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, January 11, 1999.
    The President and the House of Representatives shall have until 
5:00 p.m. on Monday, January 11, 1999, to file any motions permitted 
under the rules of impeachment except for motions to subpoena witnesses 
or to present any evidence not in the record. Responses to any such 
motions shall be filed no later than 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, January 
13, 1999. The President may file a trial brief at or before that time. 
The House of Representatives may file a rebuttal brief no later than 
10:00 a.m. on Thursday, January 14, 1999.
    Arguments on such motions shall begin at 1:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 
January 13, 1999, and each side may determine the number of persons to 
make its presentation, following which the Senate shall deliberate and 
vote on any such motions. Following the disposition of these motions, 
or if no motions occur then at 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, January 14, 1999, 
the House of Representatives shall make it's presentation in support of 
the articles of impeachment for a period of time not to exceed 24 
hours. Each side may determine the number of persons to make it's 
presentation. The presentation shall be limited to argument from the 
record. Following the House of Representatives presentation, the 
President shall make his presentation for a period not to exceed 24 
hours as outlined in the paragraph above with reference to the House of 
Representatives presentation.
    Upon the conclusion of the President's presentation, Senators may 
question the parties for a period of time not to exceed 16 hours.
    After the conclusion of questioning by the Senate, it shall be in 
order to consider and debate a motion to dismiss as outlined by the 
impeachment rules. Following debate it shall be in order to make a 
motion to subpoena witnesses and/or to present any evidence not in the 
record, with debate time on that motion limited to 6 hours, to be 
equally divided between the two parties. Following debate and any 
deliberation as provided in the impeachment rules, the Senate will 
proceed to vote on the motion to dismiss, and if defeated, an immediate 
vote on the motion to subpoena witnesses and/or to present any evidence 
not in the record, all without intervening action, motion, amendment or 
debate.
    If the Senate agrees to allow either the House of Representatives 
or the President to call witnesses, the witnesses shall first be 
deposed and the Senate shall decide after deposition which witnesses 
shall testify, pursuant to the impeachment rules. Further, the time for 
depositions shall be agreed to by both leaders. No testimony shall be 
admissible in the Senate unless the parties have had an opportunity to 
depose such witnesses.
    If the Senate fails to dismiss the case, the parties will proceed 
to present evidence. At the conclusion of the deliberations by the 
Senate, the Senate shall proceed to vote on each article of 
impeachment.
                                 <all>