There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/27/1999)

Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees from October 1, 1999, through September 30, 2000, and October 1, 2000, through February 28, 2001: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Armed Services; (3) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (4) Budget; (5) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (6) Energy and Natural Resources; (7) Environment and Public Works; (8) Finance; (9) Foreign Relations; (10) Governmental Affairs; (11) Judiciary; (12) Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions; (13) Rules and Administration; (14) Small Business; (15) Veterans' Affairs; (16) Aging; (17) Intelligence; and (18) Indian Affairs.

Provides that within the funds in the account "Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations" appropriated by the legislative branch appropriations Acts for FY 2000 and 2001 there is authorized to be established a special reserve to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.