Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 02/22/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/22/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/02/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/02/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/02/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/04/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/04/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/04/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/04/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/04/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/08/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/11/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/11/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/15/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/22/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/23/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/23/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/25/1999