Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/19/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 01/20/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 01/20/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 01/21/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/21/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 01/22/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/25/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/10/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/10/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/24/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/12/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/13/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/15/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/15/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 04/15/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/15/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/19/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/21/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/26/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/28/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/29/1999