Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/24/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/01/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/20/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/06/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/06/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/06/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/06/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/06/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/06/2000