Text: S.Res.267 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (10/12/2000)

 
[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 267 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]







106th CONGRESS
  2d Session
S. RES. 267

       Directing the return of certain treaties to the President.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             March 9, 2000

    Mr. Helms from the Committee on Foreign Relations, reported the 
   following original resolution; which was placed on the executive 
                                calendar

            October 12 (legislative day, September 22), 2000

                   Considered, amended, and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                          EXECUTIVE RESOLUTION


 
       Directing the return of certain treaties to the President.

    Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate shall return to the 
President of the United States the following treaties:
            (1) The Optional Protocol of Signature Concerning the 
        Compulsory Settlement of Disputes. (Ex. N, 861 (Treaty Doc. 86-
        14)).
            (2) The International Convention on Civil Liability for Oil 
        Pollution Damage done in Brussels at the International Legal 
        Conference on Marine Pollution Damage, signed on November 29, 
        1969 (Ex. G, 91-2 (Treaty Doc. 91-17)).
            (3)(A) The International Convention on the Establishment of 
        an International Fund for Compensation for Oil Pollution Damage 
        (Supplementary to the International Convention on Civil 
        Liability for Oil Pollution Damage of 1969), done at Brussels, 
        December 18, 1971.
            (B) Certain Amendments to the International Convention for 
        the Prevention of Pollution of the Sea by Oil of 1954, relating 
        to Tanker Tank Size and Arrangement and the Protection of the 
        Great Barrier Reef. (Ex. K, 92-2 (Treaty Doc. 92-23)).
            (4) The Trademark Registration Treaty, done at Vienna on 
        June 12, 1973 (Ex. H, 94-1 (Treaty Doc. 94-8)).
            (5) The Treaty Between the United States of America and the 
        Union of Soviet Socialist Republics on the Limitation of 
        Strategic Offensive Arms and the Protocol Thereto, together 
        referred to as the ``SALT II Treaty'', both signed at Vienna, 
        Austria, on June 18, 1979, and related documents (Ex. Y, 96-1 
        (Treaty Doc. 96-25)).
            (6) The Convention with Denmark for the Avoidance of Double 
        Taxation and the Prevention of Fiscal Evasion with Respect to 
        Taxes on Income, signed at Washington on June 17, 1980 (Ex. Q, 
        96-2 (Treaty Doc. 96-52)).
            (7) The Convention on the Recognition of Studies, Diplomas 
        and Degrees Concerning Higher Education in the States Belonging 
        to the Europe Region, signed on behalf of the United States on 
        December 21, 1979 (Ex. V, 96-2 (Treaty Doc. 96-57)).
            (8) The Protocol Amending the Convention of August 16, 
        1916, for the Protection of Migratory Birds in Canada and the 
        United States of America, signed at Ottawa January 30, 1979 
        (Ex. W, 96-2 (Treaty Doc. 96-58)).
            (9) The Supplementary Convention on Extradition Between the 
        United States of America and the Kingdom of Sweden, signed at 
        Washington on May 27, 1981 (Treaty Doc. 97-15).
            (10) The Protocol, signed at Washington on August 23, 1983, 
        together with an exchange of letters, Amending the Convention 
        Between the Government of the United States of America and the 
        Government of the Kingdom of Denmark for the Avoidance of 
        Double Taxation and the Prevention of Fiscal Evasion with 
        Respect to Taxes on Income, signed at Washington on June 17, 
        1980 (Treaty Doc. 98-12).
            (11) The Consular Convention Between the United States of 
        America and the Republic of South Africa, signed at Pretoria on 
        October 28, 1982 (Treaty Doc. 98-14).
            (12) The Protocol signed at Washington on October 12, 1984, 
        Amending the Interim Convention on Conservation of North 
        Pacific Fur Seals Between the United States, Canada, Japan, and 
        the Soviet Union (Treaty Doc. 99-5).
            (13)(A) The Protocol of 1984 to Amend the International 
        Convention on Civil Liability for Oil Pollution Damage, 1969 
        (Civil Liability Convention).
            (B) The Protocol of 1984 to Amend the International 
        Convention on the Establishment of an International Fund for 
        Compensation for Oil Pollution Damage, 1971 (Fund Convention) 
        (Treaty Doc. 99-12).
            (14) The Treaty Between the United States of America and 
        the Republic of Haiti Concerning the Reciprocal Encouragement 
        and Protection of Investment, with Protocol, signed at 
        Washington, December 13, 1983 (Treaty Doc. 99-16).
            (15) The Consular Convention Between the United States of 
        America and the Socialist Federal Republic of Yugoslavia, 
        signed at Belgrade June 6, 1988 (Treaty Doc. 101-3).
            (16) The Treaty on the International Registration of 
        Audiovisual Works. (Treaty Doc. 101-8).
            (17) The Protocol Amending the Convention Between the 
        United States of America and Canada with Respect to Taxes on 
        Income and on Capital signed at Washington on September 26, 
        1980, as amended by the Protocols signed on June 14, 1983, and 
        March 28, 1984, signed at Washington August 31, 1994 (Treaty 
        Doc. 103-28).
                                 <all>

Share This