Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/08/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/08/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/08/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/08/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/08/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 02/08/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/08/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/22/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/22/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/22/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/22/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/08/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/13/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/13/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/13/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/13/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/13/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/13/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/13/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/13/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/13/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/13/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/13/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/13/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/14/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/14/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/19/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 04/19/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/19/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/19/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/20/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/20/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/21/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/21/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/21/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/21/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/22/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/22/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/26/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/26/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/28/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/28/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/28/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/28/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/28/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/28/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/28/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 04/28/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/28/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 04/28/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/28/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/28/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/28/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/28/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/28/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/28/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/28/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/28/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/28/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/29/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/30/1999