Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/27/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/27/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/27/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/27/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/07/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/07/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/07/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/07/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/07/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/19/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/19/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/19/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/19/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/19/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/19/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/19/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/19/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/19/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/19/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/25/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/25/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/25/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/25/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/27/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/27/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/27/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/27/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/27/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/27/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/27/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/27/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/12/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/12/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/12/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/12/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/12/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/12/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/12/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/12/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/12/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/12/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/12/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/12/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/12/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/12/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/12/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/12/2000