Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 07/21/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/27/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/27/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/27/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/27/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/27/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/07/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/07/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/07/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/07/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/25/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/27/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/27/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/27/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/27/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/27/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/12/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/12/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/12/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/12/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/12/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/12/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/12/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/24/2000