Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/26/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/27/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/27/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/28/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/28/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/28/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/28/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/28/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/02/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/02/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/03/2000