There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution designating the week of March 21 through March 27, 1999, as "National Inhalants and Poisons Awareness Week".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/18/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
03/18/1999Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2976-2977)
02/12/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
03/18/1999Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
03/18/1999Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2976-2977)
02/12/1999Referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/12/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/22/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/22/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/24/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 02/24/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/02/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/02/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/02/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/02/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/04/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/04/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/08/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/10/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/11/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/11/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/11/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/11/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/11/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/11/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/11/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/11/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/11/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/11/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/11/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/11/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/11/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/11/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/11/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/11/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/11/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/11/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/11/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/11/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/16/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/16/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/17/1999

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/12/1999 Referred to
03/18/1999 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.Res.47.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.47. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/12/1999)

Designates the week of March 21 through March 27, 1999, as National Inhalants and Poisons Awareness Week.

Encourages parents to learn about the dangers of inhalant abuse and to discuss those dangers with their children.