Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/12/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/12/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/22/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/22/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/24/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/24/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/02/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/02/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/02/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/02/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/04/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/04/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/08/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/10/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/11/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/11/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/11/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/11/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/11/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/11/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/11/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/11/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/11/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/11/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/11/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/11/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/11/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/11/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/11/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/11/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/11/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/11/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/11/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/11/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/11/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/11/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/16/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/16/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/17/1999