Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 02/25/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/02/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/02/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/04/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/08/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/10/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/15/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/24/1999