Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/05/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/05/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/05/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/05/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/05/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/05/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/12/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/12/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/12/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/07/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/07/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/07/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/09/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/14/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/14/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/14/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/15/1999