Refine your search

Showing 18 of 18 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/08/2002 Became Public Law No: 107-110.
01/08/2002 Signed by President.
01/04/2002 Presented to President.
12/18/2001 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 87 - 10. Record Vote Number: 371.
12/13/2001 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by recorded vote: 381 - 41 (Roll no. 497).
12/13/2001 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 107-334 filed.(text of conference report: CR 12/12/2001 H9773-10052)
12/11/2001 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
11/30/2001 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
10/30/2001 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
09/25/2001 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
08/01/2001 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
07/19/2001 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
07/10/2001 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Kennedy, Dodd, Harkin, Mikulski, Jeffords, Bingaman, Wellstone, Murray, Reed, Edwards, Clinton, Lieberman, Bayh, Gregg, Frist, Enzi, Hutchinson, Warner, Bond, Roberts, Collins, Sessions, DeWine, Allard and Ensign.
06/14/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 1 with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 91 - 8. Record Vote Number: 192.(text: CR 6/22/2001 CR S6672-6831)
05/23/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 384 - 45 (Roll no. 145).(text of measure as reported: 5/22/2001 CR H2421-2516)
05/15/2001 Committee on Judiciary discharged.
05/14/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 107-63, Part I.
03/22/2001 Introduced in House