Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/21/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-90.
12/21/2001 Signed by President.
12/13/2001 Presented to President.
12/11/2001 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 369 - 33 (Roll no. 485).(consideration: CR H9160-9166, H9167-9168; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9160-9164)
12/05/2001 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 90 - 9. Record Vote Number: 351.
05/02/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 407 - 24 (Roll no. 96).(text: CR H1764-1780)
05/01/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 107-51, Part II.
05/01/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-51, Part I.
03/14/2001 Introduced in House