Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/21/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/21/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/21/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/21/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/04/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/15/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/28/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/28/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/11/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/11/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/11/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/18/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/24/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/02/2001