Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 03/13/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/22/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 03/22/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/22/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/09/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/12/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/12/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/21/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/21/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/05/2001