Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/17/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/17/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/05/2002