There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Railroad Track Modernization Act of 2001

Short Titles as Introduced

Railroad Track Modernization Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Transportation to establish a grant program for the rehabilitation, preservation, or improvement of railroad track.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/12/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-96.
03/14/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
06/12/2001Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 52.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-96.
05/16/2001Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/16/2001Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/09/2001Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads
05/09/2001Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads
03/15/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/14/2001Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (100)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/22/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/22/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/29/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/29/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/04/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/04/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/26/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/03/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/08/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/08/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/10/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/17/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/07/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/14/2001 Referred to
05/16/2001 Markup by
06/12/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-96
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads03/15/2001 Referred to
05/09/2001 Markup by
05/09/2001 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1020. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (06/12/2001)

Railroad Track Modernization Act of 2001 - Amends Federal rail transportation law to direct the Secretary of Transportation to establish a program of capital grants to class II and class III railroads (or with the concurrence of such railroads, to a State or local government) to rehabilitate, preserve, or improve railroad track (including roadbed, bridges, and related track structures) used primarily for freight transportation to a standard to ensure that it can be operated safely and efficiently and accommodate 286,000 pound rail cars.

Declares that the Federal share of costs for such projects shall be 80 percent.

Sets forth certain grant and project requirements.

Authorizes the Secretary to also make grants to supplement direct loans or loan guarantees (including for paying credit risk premiums, lowering rates of interest, or providing for a holiday on principal payments) for projects primarily benefitting non-class I freight railroad carriers.

Sets forth certain employee protection and prevailing wage requirements with respect to projects financed by such grants.

Directs the Secretary to study and report to Congress on such projects to determine the public interest benefits associated with the light density railroad networks in the States and their contribution to a multimodal transportation system.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 2002 through 2004.