Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/22/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/22/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/29/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/29/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/04/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/04/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/26/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/03/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/08/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/08/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/08/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/10/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/17/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/17/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/07/2001