Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/03/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/10/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/24/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/14/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/21/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/02/2001