There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Increased Individual Retirement Accounts for All Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the annual limitation on deductible contributions to individual retirement accounts to $5,000, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/14/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/14/2001Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/27/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/27/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/18/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/14/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1026.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1026. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/14/2001)

Increased Individual Retirement Accounts for All Act of 2001 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) increase the annual limitation on deductible contributions to individual retirement accounts (IRAs) to $5,000 and provide a cost-of-living adjustment to such amount; (2) provide for increased "catch-up" contributions for individuals aged 50 or older; and (3) until December 31, 2005, allow a nonrefundable credit to certain individuals for elective deferrals and IRA contributions.