Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/31/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/07/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/27/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/11/2002