Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/19/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/03/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/06/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/26/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/11/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/11/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/11/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/10/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/10/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/21/2001