Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/29/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/04/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/22/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/31/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/12/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/12/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/05/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/25/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/26/2002