Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/14/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 03/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/10/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/10/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/10/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/10/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/10/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/10/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/10/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/10/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/10/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/10/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/10/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/10/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/10/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/10/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/10/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/10/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/10/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/10/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/10/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/10/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/10/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/10/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/10/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/10/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/10/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/10/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/25/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/25/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/25/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/25/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/25/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/25/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/25/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/21/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/21/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/21/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/21/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/07/2002